Global Patent Index - EP 0885573 B1

EP 0885573 B1 2000-05-03 - Head for a toothbrush

Title (en)

Head for a toothbrush

Title (de)

Bürstenkopf für eine Zahnbürste

Title (fr)

Tête de brosse à dents

Publication

EP 0885573 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810517 A

Priority

CH 147797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885573A1] The brush head has in the longitudinal direction at least one group of transverse rows of bristle tufts (4) perpendicular to the bristle support (3) and set alongside a pair of transverse rows of bristle tufts (5,6) set inclined to the bristle support in the longitudinal direction of the brush head. The longitudinally inclined bristle tufts (6) of one of these rows is inclined forwards and the bristle tufts of the other of these rows is inclined backwards so that the two tufts (5,6) of these two rows cross one another to form in pairs an X-shape arrangement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0885573 A1 19981223; EP 0885573 B1 20000503; EP 0885573 B2 20030521; AT 192291 T 20000515; CH 689480 A5 19990514; DE 59800140 D1 20000608; DK 0885573 T3 20000807; ES 2144890 T3 20000616

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800140

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800140

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110608

2012-01-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120101

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100614

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-02-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-01-09 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000503

2003-11-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2003-09-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-06-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2003-06-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030609

2003-06-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030609

2003-06-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030608

2003-05-21 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-06-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020613

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020530

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020529

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020527

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: C SCHIFFER GMBH

2001-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: M+C SCHIFFER GMBH

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144890 T3

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800140 20000608

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192291 T 20000515

2000-04-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990816

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990306

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI