Global Patent Index - EP 0885586 B1

EP 0885586 B1 2000-03-01 - Wiping element for vacuum cleaner nozzles

Title (en)

Wiping element for vacuum cleaner nozzles

Title (de)

Abstreifelement für Staubsaugerdüsen

Title (fr)

Elément d'essorage pour des suceurs d'aspirateur

Publication

EP 0885586 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109999 A

Priority

EP 97109999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885586A1] A wiper element for a vacuum cleaner nozzle consists of a brush bar (2) and a scraper blade (3) made of an elastomeric material which with the brush bar forms a functional unit that can be fastened in a groove on the underside of the vacuum cleaner nozzle. The blade has a smooth wiping edge protruding on the bottom side from the brush bar as well as openings (6) in a row above the edge in the longitudinal direction. The brush bar is provided with notches in the region of the openings. The blade consists of a head-side thickened bit (8) and a moulded flexible stripping lip on it. The thickened bit lies on the brush bar and the lip, which contains the wiping edge and the openings, is aligned at a distance from the bar, and is freely movable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/0653 (2013.01); A47L 9/06 (2013.01); A47L 9/0613 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0885586 A1 19981223; EP 0885586 B1 20000301; DE 59701173 D1 20000406

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100619

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701173

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990706

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980103

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT