Global Patent Index - EP 0885666 A3

EP 0885666 A3 2000-04-12 - Tool, in particular a pipe cleaning tool

Title (en)

Tool, in particular a pipe cleaning tool

Title (de)

Werkzeug, insbesondere Rohrreinigungswerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil, en particulier un outil pour le nettoyage de tubes

Publication

EP 0885666 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110625 A

Priority

DE 19725636 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885666A2] A tool, esp a cleansing tool, comprises at least one attachment which can be located in a drive holder and fixed so it cannot rotate. The holder (6) consists of a follower (30) and an axial safety member (31) for the attachment (5). The attachment and/or the holder pref. consist of polyamide. Use - The device is used as a cleansing tool. Advantage - The attachment cannot be damaged when it is located in the holder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0885666 A2 19981223; EP 0885666 A3 20000412; DE 19725636 A1 19981224; DE 19725636 B4 20050929

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020325

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR IT

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI