Global Patent Index - EP 0885668 A3

EP 0885668 A3 2000-07-05 - Coil forming head for forming loops from wire leaving a wire rolling mill

Title (en)

Coil forming head for forming loops from wire leaving a wire rolling mill

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bildung von Schlingen aus einem aus einer Walzdrahtstrasse austretenden Drahtstrang mittels eines rotierenden Schlingenlegers

Title (fr)

Tête de formation de boucles de fil à partir d'un film sortant d'un laminoir

Publication

EP 0885668 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110736 A

Priority

DE 19725774 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885668A2] The loop layer and also the drive device are arranged inclined to the horizontal. With a fixed arrangement of the drive device (TE) and the loop layer (SL) at a predetermined angle of inclination, the conveyor (4) accommodating the loop is formed adjustably as to its pivot angle to the horizontal. The pivot axis (5) for the angle adjustment of the conveyor (4) is arranged at a distance beneath it from the end (4b) turned away from the loop accommodation end (4a). The drive of the drive device (TE) can be regulated. With the drive of both drive rollers (1, 2) of the drive device (TR), their pressure is activated by pressure-regulatable pneumatic-piston-cylinder units.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/14; B21C 47/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/16 (2006.01); B21B 39/12 (2006.01); B21C 47/14 (2006.01); B21C 47/24 (2006.01); B21C 47/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/26 (2013.01); B21C 47/143 (2013.01); B21C 47/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0885668 A2 19981223; EP 0885668 A3 20000705; EP 0885668 B1 20021127; AT 228404 T 20021215; DE 19725774 A1 19981224; JP H1177154 A 19990323; US 5944275 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-06-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050612

2005-06-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050612

2004-06-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040604

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806402 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228404 T 20021215

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT SE

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21C 47/14 A, 7B 21C 47/26 B

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980612

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI