Global Patent Index - EP 0885795 B1

EP 0885795 B1 2003-06-18 - Locking device

Title (en)

Locking device

Title (de)

Verschlussvorricthung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0885795 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106665 A

Priority

CH 150797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885795A1] The locking device has a lock bearing (40) and a lock carrier (30), both with support surfaces (42,32). Points tongue (20) and stock rail (50) are held on the surfaces by positive and/or non- positive connection. Both lock bearing and carrier have a head element (41,31), which is similarly connected to the web (23,53) of points tongue resp. stock rail. A foot element (43) on the lock bearing engages on the foot element (33) of the lock carrier when in locking position. Alternatively, the bearing foot element contains an adjusting pin (7a). This is set to engage on the foot element of the carrier when in locking position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0885795 A1 19981223; EP 0885795 B1 20030618; AT 243130 T 20030715; DE 59808733 D1 20030724; NO 982887 A 19981221; NO 982887 D0 19980619

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-04-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59808733

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150411

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150411

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110411

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 243130 T

- Effective date: 20110411

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100310

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-13 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050412

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808733 P 20030724

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990623

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI