Global Patent Index - EP 0885949 B1

EP 0885949 B1 2000-08-09 - Use of a grease composition for maintenance-free articulated transmission shaft

Title (en)

Use of a grease composition for maintenance-free articulated transmission shaft

Title (de)

Verwendung einer Schmierfettzusammentsetzung für wartungsfreie Gelenkwellen

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'une composition de graisse pour arbre articulé de transmission ne nécessitant pas d'entretien

Publication

EP 0885949 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98109053 A

Priority

  • DE 19726127 A
  • DE 19817055 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885949A1] Grease for maintenance-free drive shafts contains: (a) naphthenic and/or paraffinic solvent raffinate(s) as base; (b) a Li salt of a 10-24 C hydroxy-fatty acid or a 2-12 C (cyclo)aliphatic dicarboxylic acid; (c) neutral oil(s); and (d) a Mo, Zn or Bi dithiocarbamate or dithiophosphate together with a thiadiazole and also antioxidants, corrosion inhibitors and high pressure additives normally used in lubricants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 169/00 (2006.01); C10M 169/06 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 10/10 (2006.01); C10N 10/12 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/00 (2013.01); C10M 169/06 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1025 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2205/00 (2013.01); C10M 2205/02 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0206 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0265 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1245 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/16 (2013.01); C10M 2207/22 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/40 (2013.01); C10M 2207/402 (2013.01); C10M 2207/404 (2013.01); C10M 2213/00 (2013.01); C10M 2213/04 (2013.01); C10M 2213/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/12 (2013.01); C10M 2215/122 (2013.01); C10M 2215/224 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2219/108 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2229/02 (2013.01); C10M 2229/025 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0405 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0415 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0425 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0435 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0445 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0455 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0465 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0475 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0485 (2013.01); C10M 2229/05 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0505 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0515 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0525 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0535 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0545 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/05 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 169/00 + C10M 101/02 + C10M 105/38 + C10M 107/02 + C10M 107/08 + C10M 107/50 + C10M 117/04 + C10M 117/06 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 129/58 + C10M 133/12 + C10M 133/16 + C10M 133/46 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 135/36 + C10M 137/10 + C10M 159/08
  2. C10M 169/06 + C10M 117/04 + C10M 117/06 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 135/36 + C10M 137/10

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0885949 A1 19981223; EP 0885949 B1 20000809; ES 2152724 T3 20010201; JP H1121579 A 19990126; US 6541427 B1 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800225

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040520

2005-05-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-12-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-05-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-05-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040519

2003-07-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2003-05-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030519

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: FUCHS EUROPE SCHMIERSTOFFE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2003-02-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SPICER GELENKWELLENBAU GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152724

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-01-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FUCHS DEA SCHMIERSTOFF GMBH & CO. KG EN SPICER GEL

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2000-10-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800225

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-09-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FUCHS DEA SCHMIERSTOFF GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-09-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SPICER GELENKWELLENBAU GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2000-05-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF A GREASE COMPOSITION FOR MAINTENANCE-FREE ARTICULATED TRANSMISSION SHAFT

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUCHS DEA SCHMIERSTOFF GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GWB GELENKWELLENBAU GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT NL SE

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990322

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990130

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI