Global Patent Index - EP 0885953 B1

EP 0885953 B1 2001-12-12 - HIGH-DENSITY GRANULATED DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

HIGH-DENSITY GRANULATED DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

GRANULIERTE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HOHEM SCHÜTTGEWICHT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE DETERGENT GRANULEE HAUTE DENSITE

Publication

EP 0885953 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97900465 A

Priority

  • JP 9700111 W
  • JP 856096 A
  • JP 3378896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727282A1] A high-density granulated detergent composition having a bulk density of 0.6 to 1.2 g/ml, which comprises 0.5 to 30 wt.% of an aspartic acid-N,N-diacetic acid salt (a), 20 to 50 wt.% of an anionic surfactant (b) and 1 to 30 wt.% of an aluminosilicate (d), each percentage being based on the total weight of the composition, and which further contains a nonionic surfactant (c) having an HLB value of 10.5 to 15.0 in an amount of 0.5 to 25 parts by weight per 100 parts by weight of the component (b). This composition contains an organic builder excellent in biodegradability together with an inorganic builder and exhibits high detergency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/33; C11D 3/37; C11D 10/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/68 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 10/02 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/33 (2013.01); C11D 3/124 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 17/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727282 A1 19970731; DE 69709067 D1 20020124; DE 69709067 T2 20020822; EP 0885953 A1 19981223; EP 0885953 A4 19990825; EP 0885953 B1 20011212; JP 3221830 B2 20011022; JP H09263797 A 19971007

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69709067

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69709067

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130204

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709067 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000818

1999-08-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19990714

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 11D 17/06 A, 6C 11D 3/33 B, 6C 11D 3/37 B, 6C 11D 10/02 B, 6C 11D 3/12 B

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980720

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB