Global Patent Index - EP 0885980 A3

EP 0885980 A3 2000-10-11 - Process for forming a superficial layer having a high hardness by plasma-free thermochemical treatment

Title (en)

Process for forming a superficial layer having a high hardness by plasma-free thermochemical treatment

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Oberflächenschicht von grosser Härte durch thermochemische plasmafreie Behandlung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la formation, par traitement thermochimique sans plasma, d'une couche superficielle présentant une dureté élevée

Publication

EP 0885980 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98401235 A

Priority

FR 9706518 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885980A2] A hard surface layer is formed on a piece of alloy which is reactive with nitrogen, oxygen or carbon, such as titanium or zirconium, by heating the piece to over 650 degrees C in an enclosure where the pressure is no more than 0.1 mbar, then injecting a suitable reactive gas but still maintaining a pressure below atmospheric for a period between a few tens of minutes and 24 hours or more, depending on the layer thickness required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/24; C23C 8/06; C23C 8/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/06 (2006.01); C23C 8/20 (2006.01); C23C 8/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/06 (2013.01); C23C 8/20 (2013.01); C23C 8/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 4239392 A1 19930603 - VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]
  • [A] EP 0449793 A1 19911002 - YTBOLAGET I UPPSALA AB [SE]
  • [A] FR 2136037 A5 19721222 - METAUX PRECIEUX SA
  • [A] EP 0465333 A1 19920108 - AUBERT & DUVAL ACIERIES [FR]
  • [A] F. PREISSER: "hochdrucknitrieren von titanwerkstoffen", HTM HARTEREI-TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN, vol. 46, no. 6, November 1991 (1991-11-01) - December 1991 (1991-12-01), MUNICH,DE, pages 361 - 366, XP000237447
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 007 31 August 1995 (1995-08-31)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8714, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M13, AN 87-097023, XP002054660
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 426 (C - 542) 10 November 1988 (1988-11-10)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763604 A1 19981127; FR 2763604 B1 19990702; DE 69831530 D1 20051020; DE 69831530 T2 20060614; EP 0885980 A2 19981223; EP 0885980 A3 20001011; EP 0885980 B1 20050914; ES 2247665 T3 20060301

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247665 T3

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69831530 P 20051020

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BODYCOTE

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BODYCOTE HIT

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 23C 8/24 A, 7C 23C 8/20 B, 7C 23C 8/06 B

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990126

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI