Global patent index - EP 0885989 A3

EP 0885989 A3 2000-02-23 - Multiple-twist spindle with rotating balloon limiting mantle

Title (en)

Multiple-twist spindle with rotating balloon limiting mantle

Title (de)

Mehrfachdraht-Zwirnspindel mit rotierendem Ballonbegrenzer

Title (fr)

Broche de retordage à torsion multiple avec un pot rotatif limitant le ballon

Publication

EP 0885989 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107106 A

Priority

DE 19726450 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726450C1] A novel twisted thread cord spindle includes a rotary disc (8). This has a thread guide channel connecting radially to the hollow spindle axis (7). It continues with a channel (11) turning the thread axially, its exit opening directed into the gap between the co-rotating ballooning limiter (12) and the internal spool carrier protector (25), which counter rotates to the limiter. This forms part of the spool carrier and its base (22). In original design, in the radially outer region of the base (22) of the spool carrier protector (25), below and with axial clearance from it, there is a thread interception ring (8.1) co-rotating with the limiter (12) and of which the outer diameter is less than that of the spool carrier protector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 7/86; D01H 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/42 (2006.01); D01H 7/18 (2006.01); D01H 7/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/427 (2013.01); D01H 7/868 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726450 C1 19980702; CN 1203287 A 19981230; CZ 9801958 A3 19990113; EP 0885989 A2 19981223; EP 0885989 A3 20000223; TR 9801159 A2 19991021; TR 9801159 A3 19991021; US 5979154 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-06-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030211

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH FR GB IT LI

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI