Global Patent Index - EP 0885990 B1

EP 0885990 B1 2001-05-23 - Textile fabric with network structure

Title (en)

Textile fabric with network structure

Title (de)

Textilgewebe mit Netzstruktur

Title (fr)

Tissu textile avec structure de filet

Publication

EP 0885990 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105265 A

Priority

DE 29705932 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885990A1] The textile fabric (10) with a net structure is woven densely and at least one transparent yarn (11,11',11'') is incorporated into it. The transparent yarn - a pick or a warp end - comprises a polyamide wire or a metal wire.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/0033 (2013.01); D03D 15/02 (2013.01); D10B 2101/20 (2013.01); D10B 2331/02 (2013.01); D10B 2401/061 (2013.01); D10B 2505/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29705932 U1 19970612; EP 0885990 A1 19981223; EP 0885990 B1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180323

2018-04-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180323

2018-03-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59800747

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59800747

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2007-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-02-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800747 20010628

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000119

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990224

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI