Global Patent Index - EP 0885991 B1

EP 0885991 B1 2000-11-29 - Process for monitoring the operation of a weft feeler on air jet looms

Title (en)

Process for monitoring the operation of a weft feeler on air jet looms

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Funktionsüberwachung eines Schussfadenwächters in Luftdüsenwebmaschinen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la surveillance du fonctionnement d'un détecteur de trame sur métiers à tisser à jet d'air

Publication

EP 0885991 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106022 A

Priority

DE 19716587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716587C1] A method of monitoring a loom, specifically functioning of optical barriers of a weft fibre monitor (1) located at the exit of the weft fibre input channel of the weaving reed of an air-jet loom (6). The monitor (1) has two optical barrier units ( 2, 3; hereafter: beams), and (a) within an angular segment ( alpha 1) of each turn of the mainshaft, the first beam (2) electrically signals (S1) correct weft fibre introduction, to an instrument (8); and (b) within ( alpha 1), the second beam signals (S2) incorrect weft fibre introduction. The weaving machine controller (9) switches off the main-shaft drive (10) with a signal (S0), in accordance with the result of comparison between the measured signals (S1, S2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 51/34; D03D 51/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/30 (2006.01); D03D 51/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/3073 (2013.01); D03D 51/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716587 C1 19980903; AT 197824 T 20001215; EP 0885991 A1 19981223; EP 0885991 B1 20001129; ES 2154066 T3 20010316; JP 3263026 B2 20020304; JP H10317261 A 19981202; PT 885991 E 20010430; US 6014991 A 20000118

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDAUER DORNIER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060403

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060402

2006-11-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-10-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-07-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060403

2006-04-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060403

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060402

2006-04-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060402

2006-03-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050406

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050404

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154066 T3

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800353 20010104

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197824 T 20001215

2000-05-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990129

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI