Global Patent Index - EP 0885995 B1

EP 0885995 B1 2002-09-18 - Device for drying laundry

Title (en)

Device for drying laundry

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trocknen von Wäschestücken

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour sécher le linge

Publication

EP 0885995 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810535 A

Priority

CH 148997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885995A1] An installation is for drying laundry items and has a suspended grid (1) with an oblong beam (2) which is joined flexibly to two lower ends (13, 14) of the rods (9, 10). The rods (9, 10) intersect in the manner of scissors. The two top ends (13, 14) of the rods (9, 10) are held flexibly on a guide beam which extends in parallel to the ceiling. At least one of the bottom ends and one of the top ends of the intersecting rod elements (9, 10) is guided slidingly on the beam (2, 15) and, as a result, the grid (1) can be pulled high up towards the ceiling. The intersecting rods prevent an oscillating movement of the grid 01) in the longitudinal direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 57/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0885995 A1 19981223; EP 0885995 B1 20020918; AT 224473 T 20021015; DE 59805579 D1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060611

2005-06-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050504

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STEINER WALTER

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805579 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224473 T 20021015

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE GB LI NL

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990623

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI NL

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI