Global Patent Index - EP 0885999 A3

EP 0885999 A3 2000-02-23 - Process for ink jet printing textile materials

Title (en)

Process for ink jet printing textile materials

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bedrucken von textilen Fasermaterialien nach dem Tintenstrahldruck-Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression de matériaux textiles par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0885999 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810524 A

Priority

CH 147497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0885999A2] An ink jet printing method for use on textiles, where the aqueous ink used contains: (a) specified reactive dye(s) (I), and (b) 1,2-propylene glycol (PG), N-methyl-2-pyrrolidone (NMP), alginate or a water-soluble, non-ionogenic cellulose ether (II); where (I) are selected from 4-(2-sulphophenyl amino-4-chloro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl-amino)-2-(1-ethyl-2-hydroxy-4-methyl -5-sulphomethyl-pyrid-6-on-3-yl-azo)-benzenesulphonic acid (IA); 8-(2-(N-ethyl-N-phenylamino)-4-chloro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl-amino)-2-(2-s ulphophenyl-azo)-1-hydroxynaphthalene-3,6-disulphonic acid (IB); 6-(N-methyl-N-(2-amino-4-chloro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl)-amino)-2-(1,5-disu lphonaphth-2-yl-azo)-1-hydroxynaphthalene-3-sulphonic acid (IC); 5-(2-( beta -( beta -hydroxyethoxy)ethylamino)-4-chloro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl-amino)-2-(3,6,8 -trisulphonaphth-2-yl-azo)-phenylurea (ID); 8-(2-(N-ethyl-N-phenylamino)-4-chloro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl-amino)-2-(1-s ulpho- or- 1,5-disulphonaphth-2-yl-azo)-1-hydroxynaphthalene-3,6-disulphonic acid (IE); 1-amino- 4-(3-(2-sulphophenyla mino-4-chloro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl-amino)-2,4,6-trimethyl-5-sulphophenyl amino)-anthraquinone-2-sulphonic acid (IF); 1-amino-4-(3-(2-(2,5-disulphophenyl amino)-4-chloro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl-amino-tert.-pentylamino)-anthraquin one-2-sulphonic acid (IG); a copper phthalocyanine sulphonic acid sulphonamide of formula: (IH) (in which CuPhC = a copper phthalocyanine group); the 1:2 chromium complex (Ii) of 8-(2-amino-4-chloro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl-amino)-2-(2-hydroxy-5-nitrophen yl-azo)-1-hydroxynaphthalene-3,6-disulphonic acid; or the 1:2 cobalt complex (Ij) of 6-(2-amino-4-chloro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl-amino)-2-(2-hydroxy-6-nitro-4-s ulphonaphth-1-yl-azo)-1-hydroxynaphthalene-3-sulphonic acid. If the ink contains (IA), it also contains NMP, alginate or (II). Also claimed are aqueous ink jet printing inks containing dye(s) (I).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 5/00; C09B 62/04; C09D 11/00; D06P 1/382; D06P 1/46; D06P 1/52; D06P 1/651

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/38 (2006.01); D06P 3/66 (2006.01); D06P 5/00 (2006.01); D06P 5/30 (2006.01); D06P 1/382 (2006.01); D06P 1/384 (2006.01); D06P 1/46 (2006.01); D06P 1/50 (2006.01); D06P 1/642 (2006.01); D06P 1/651 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 5/30 (2013.01); D06P 1/38 (2013.01); D06P 1/382 (2013.01); D06P 1/384 (2013.01); D06P 1/46 (2013.01); D06P 1/50 (2013.01); D06P 1/6426 (2013.01); D06P 1/65118 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0885999 A2 19981223; EP 0885999 A3 20000223; EP 0885999 B1 20050727; BR 9803345 A 19991103; CN 1140666 C 20040303; CN 1202550 A 19981223; DE 59812953 D1 20050901; ES 2246526 T3 20060216; ID 20433 A 19981217; JP H1112957 A 19990119; KR 100538665 B1 20060323; KR 19990007012 A 19990125; MX 227075 B 20050401; MX 9804842 A 20000801; MY 117132 A 20040531; PT 885999 E 20051031; SG 79981 A1 20010417; TR 9801118 A2 19991021; TR 9801118 A3 19991021; TW 503250 B 20020921; US 6007611 A 19991228

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-28 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20100322

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080610

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080609

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080610

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080609

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080609

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081209

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-12-22 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081209

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070711

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HUNTSMAN ADVANCED MATERIALS (SWITZERLAND) GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HUNTSMAN ADVANCED MATERIALS (SWITZERLAND) GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2006-07-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060725

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DYSTAR TEXTILFARBEN GMBH & CO DEUTSCHLAND KG

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2246526

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812953

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990529

2000-11-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI