Global patent index - EP 0886000 A3

EP 0886000 A3 2000-02-23 - Process for ink jet printing textile materials

Title (en)

Process for ink jet printing textile materials

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bedrucken von textilen Fasermaterialien nach dem Tintenstrahldruck-Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression de matériaux textile par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0886000 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810525 A

Priority

CH 147597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0886000A2] In ink jet printing on textiles, the aqueous ink used contains (a) reactive bridged bis-2-amino-4-fluoro-1,3,5-triazin-6-yl-amino dye(s) of formula (I) or reactive 2-amino-4-halo-1,3,5-triazinyl dye(s) of formula (II) and (b) a water-soluble, non-ionogenic cellulose ether or alginate; in which R1, R2, R3, R4, R5 = hydrogen (H) or optionally substituted 1-4 carbon (C) alkyl; B1 = an organic bridging group; A1, A3 = the residue of a mono-, poly- or metal complex azo, anthraquinone, phthalocyanine, formazan or dioxazine chromophore containing sulpho group(s); A2 = as A1, H or optionally substituted 1-4 C alkyl, phenyl or naphthyl; X1 = halogen; V = a fibre-reactive group of formula -N(R6)-alkylene(R)-SO2-Z (IIIA), -N(R7)-alkylene-E-alkylene'-SO2-Z (IIIB), -N(R7)-arylene-SO2-Z (IIIC), -N(R7)-arylene-(alkylene)5-W-alkylene'-SO2-Z (IIID) and (IIIE); alkylene, alkylene' = 1-6 C alkylene; arylene = phenylene or naphthylene (optionally substituted by sulpho, carboxyl, 1-4 C alkyl, 1-4 C alkoxy or halogen); Z = vinyl or -CH2-CH2-U1; U1 = a labile group; R = H, hydroxyl (OH), sulph(at)o, carboxyl, cyano (CN), halogen, 1-4 C alkoxycarbonyl, 1-4 C alkanoyloxy, carbamoyl or -SO2-Z; R6 = H, 1-4 C alkyl (optionally substituted by OH, sulph(at)o, carboxyl or CN) or -alkylene(R)-SO2-Z; R7 = H or 1-4 C alkyl (optionally substituted by carboxyl, CN, OH or sulph(at)o); E = oxygen (-O-) or imino (-NR8-); R8 = H or 1-4 C alkyl; W = -SO2-NR6-, -CONR6- or -NR6CO-; t = 0 or 1. Also claimed are aqueous ink jet printing inks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 5/00; C09B 62/04; C09B 62/503; C09D 11/00; D06P 1/382; D06P 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09B 62/06 (2006.01); C09B 62/09 (2006.01); C09B 62/503 (2006.01); C09B 62/51 (2006.01); C09B 62/513 (2006.01); C09B 62/517 (2006.01); D06P 1/382 (2006.01); D06P 1/384 (2006.01); D06P 1/90 (2006.01); D06P 5/00 (2006.01); D06P 5/30 (2006.01); D06P 1/46 (2006.01); D06P 1/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 5/30 (2013.01); D06P 1/382 (2013.01); D06P 1/46 (2013.01); D06P 1/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0886000 A2 19981223; EP 0886000 A3 20000223; EP 0886000 B1 20050720; BR 9802014 A 19990720; CN 1140667 C 20040303; CN 1202551 A 19981223; DE 59812931 D1 20050825; ES 2246065 T3 20060201; ID 20432 A 19981217; JP H1112963 A 19990119; PT 886000 E 20051031; SG 73520 A1 20000620; TR 9801119 A2 19991021; TR 9801119 A3 19991021; TW 550281 B 20030901; US 5972084 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090610

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090610

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091209

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-12-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20091209

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080506

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080628

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080425

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HUNTSMAN ADVANCED MATERIALS (SWITZERLAND) GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2246065

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812931

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI