Global Patent Index - EP 0886028 A3

EP 0886028 A3 2000-05-03 - Retaining profile

Title (en)

Retaining profile

Title (de)

Halteprofil

Title (fr)

Profil de maintien

Publication

EP 0886028 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110291 A

Priority

DE 29710495 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0886028A2] The holder profile (11,11') is made up of a vane or body frame (2) on which fixable plate-shaped plant mounts (12) lay and from which, preferable, axially perpendicular latch mount (14) stands. The cover profile (4) has means on the formed latch projection (5) of being fixable on the holder profile. The latch mount may be arranged in the centre of plant mount, whilst the recesses (15,16) may be arranged on both sides of the latch mount. The latch mount may extend over the axial length of the plant mount, whilst the recesses may be processed next to the latch mount in the plant mount.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2006.01); E06B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/302 (2013.01); E06B 1/702 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29710495 U1 19970904; EP 0886028 A2 19981223; EP 0886028 A3 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI