Global Patent Index - EP 0886030 A3

EP 0886030 A3 2001-02-14 - Venetian blind

Title (en)

Venetian blind

Title (de)

Lamellenjalousie

Title (fr)

Store vénitien

Publication

EP 0886030 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111270 A

Priority

DE 29710850 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0886030A2] A first group of adjacent slats (12) are held apart from, and parallel with, each other by flexible first turning pieces (10) to form a first section (14) of the hanging. The slats are swivelled on their horizontal longitudinal axis by a first turning appliance (40,42) driven by a first servo motor (40) for adjusting the first angle of tilt. At least one second group of adjacent slats (22) are held part from and parallel with each other by flexible second turning pieces (20) to form a second section of the blind (24). The slats are swivelled on their horizontal longitudinal axis by a second turning appliance (40',42') driven by a second servo motor (40') to adjust the second angle of tilt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/307; E06B 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2006.01); E06B 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2013.01); E06B 9/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29710850 U1 19981015; EP 0886030 A2 19981223; EP 0886030 A3 20010214

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020302

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI