Global patent index - EP 0886049 A3

EP 0886049 A3 2000-04-05 - Auxiliary air filtering device for the cooling apparatus of an agricultural tractor engine

Title (en)

Auxiliary air filtering device for the cooling apparatus of an agricultural tractor engine

Title (de)

Zusatzvorrichtung zur Luftfilterung für das Kühlungsgerät einer Maschine eines Landwirtschaftstraktors

Title (fr)

Dispositif auxiliaire de filtration d'air pour l'appareil de refroidisssement d' un tracteur agricole

Publication

EP 0886049 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97830597 A

Priority

IT TO970121 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0886049A2] Auxiliary air filtering device for the engine cooling apparatus of an agricultural tractor (1) having a cowling (2) with aerating grate openings (3), comprising a net (4) adapted to be removably applied to the cowling (2) so as to define filtering grids temporarily arranged in series with the aerating grate openings (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5490574 A 19960213 - ISHIIZUMI SEIICHI [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 220 (M - 1595) 20 April 1994 (1994-04-20)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0886049 A2 19981223; EP 0886049 A3 20000405; IT 236278 Y1 20000808; IT TO970121 U1 19981217; IT TO970121 V0 19970617

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020418

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI