Global patent index - EP 0886101 A3

EP 0886101 A3 2000-11-02 - Lamp for motor-vehicles

Title (en)

Lamp for motor-vehicles

Title (de)

Leuchte für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Lampe pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0886101 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830368 A

Priority

IT TO970530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0886101A2] A motor-vehicle lamp comprises a hollow body (2) having a front aperture closed by a transparent plate (7) and a main reflective wall (8) facing the transparent plate (7). The body of the lamp has a relatively reduced dimension in the direction orthogonal to the transparent plate (7) and includes a light source (9) located at one side of the hollow body, with which there is associated an auxiliary reflective element (10) to direct light rays emitted by the source (9) in a direction substantially parallel to the transparent plate (7), towards the main reflective wall (8), which is able to reflect these rays towards the transparent plate (7), so as to obtain a uniform light beam having the required characteristics coming out of said transparent plate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21Q 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 9/08 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/23 (2013.01); F21S 48/2218 (2013.01); F21S 48/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0886101 A2 19981223; EP 0886101 A3 20001102; EP 0886101 B1 20020821; DE 69807292 D1 20020926; DE 69807292 T2 20030508; IT 1292782 B1 19990211; IT TO970530 A1 19981221; IT TO970530 D0 19970619

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2006-06-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69807292

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-26

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21S 8/10 A

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI