Global Patent Index - EP 0886115 A3

EP 0886115 A3 2000-10-11 - Cryogenic storing device for pharmaceutical samples

Title (en)

Cryogenic storing device for pharmaceutical samples

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur tiefkalten Lagerung von pharmazeutischen Proben

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'entreposage cryogénique d'échantillons pharmaceutiques

Publication

EP 0886115 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109629 A

Priority

DE 19725641 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0886115A2] The system has a housing (1) with a swivelable bracket (3), a top (5) and a bottom (6) and with intermediate partitions (7) in between. One carrier unit at least is provided for containers and with at least one vertical swivelable bracket. At least two vertical swivelable brackets have a common swivel axis and are connected with each other and can have at least one cross bar. The system as a carrier unit contains at least one intermediate partition (7), which at the front edge has a step shaped edge (4). The system has facilities for arresting the swivelable bracket, which can be in the form of a spring shackle. A foldable handle (8) is provided at the top of the housing (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 25/00; B01L 9/06; B65D 25/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01L 9/00 (2006.01); F25D 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/00 (2013.01); B01L 9/52 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0809 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0886115 A2 19981223; EP 0886115 A3 20001011; EP 0886115 B1 20060503; AT 325319 T 20060615; DE 19725641 A1 19981224; DE 19725641 C2 19990610; DE 59813523 D1 20060608

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813523 P 20060608

2006-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060527

2006-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060511

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2006-05-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030415

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI