Global Patent Index - EP 0886121 B1

EP 0886121 B1 2002-09-04 - Projectile for a gun with a barrel

Title (en)

Projectile for a gun with a barrel

Title (de)

Geschoss für Rohrwaffen

Title (fr)

Projectile pour une arme à feu à canon tubulaire

Publication

EP 0886121 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98110660 A

Priority

DE 29710228 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0886121A2] Projectile (1) comprises a penetration shell (6) installed in the projectile bottom (7), and extends approximately over the entire usable internal space of the projectile. The penetration shell is surrounded over a major part of its length (9) by an explosive charge (4) and at least a simple splinter shell (5). The annular front support (10) of the penetration shell is designed as a splintering element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/20; F42B 12/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/08 (2006.01); F42B 12/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/204 (2013.01); F42B 12/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29710228 U1 19981015; AT 223569 T 20020915; EP 0886121 A2 19981223; EP 0886121 A3 20000705; EP 0886121 B1 20020904; NO 317184 B1 20040906; NO 982646 A 19981214; NO 982646 D0 19980609

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805377

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140611

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805377

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130814

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

- Free text: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.#STEPHANSTRASSE 49#90478 NUERNBERG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.#STEPHANSTRASSE 49#90478 NUERNBERG (DE)

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-06-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050610

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040610

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040610

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030609

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030527

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805377 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223569 T 20020915

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI