Global Patent Index - EP 0886343 A3

EP 0886343 A3 2000-04-12 - Backshell for electrical connector

Title (en)

Backshell for electrical connector

Title (de)

Endgehäuse für einen elektrischen Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Boîtier de terminaison pour connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0886343 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111090 A

Priority

DE 19726005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0886343A2] The casing consist of a cylindrical metallic part (1), in which a cable (20) comprising a screen netting (21) is inserted, and a device for manufacturing an electric contact between screen netting and casing. A sheath (2) is provided within the casing, which comprises bridges (3), extending axial and radial inwards. A metallic clamp ring (4) is provided, whose one end (4 C) is pushed in such way in axial direction over the bridges, that the screen netting is clamped between the bridges and the clamp ring of the cable, and that a support surface area of the clamp ring contacts with a corresponding surface (1 B) of the casing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/0521 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0886343 A2 19981223; EP 0886343 A3 20000412; DE 19726005 A1 19990204; US 6048227 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070508

2007-01-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031117

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI