Global patent index - EP 0886347 A3

EP 0886347 A3 2000-03-22 - Connecteur for card edge mounting

Title (en)

Connecteur for card edge mounting

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für Kartenrandmontage

Title (fr)

Connecteur à monter sur un bord de carte

Publication

EP 0886347 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110144 A

Priority

DE 19725966 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2240967C] For a plug connector for card-edge mounting, in particular a plug connector with 2 or more rows, it is proposed that the printed circuit board connection side of the plug connector should have at least one press-on body which is connected to the insulating body of the plug connector so as to be capable of rotating or hinging and in which the soldering connections of the contacts of the plug connector are held.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 23/70; H01R 23/68; H01R 43/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/72 (2011.01); H01R 13/15 (2006.01); H01R 43/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/721 (2013.01); H01R 43/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725966 C1 19981217; CA 2240967 A1 19981219; CA 2240967 C 20001212; EP 0886347 A2 19981223; EP 0886347 A3 20000322; JP 2911879 B2 19990623; JP H1186989 A 19990330; US 6030243 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030102

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 23/70 A, 7H 01R 43/20 B, 7H 01R 23/68 B

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI