Global Patent Index - EP 0886480 B1

EP 0886480 B1 2001-12-12 - RUFFLING SLIDE AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

RUFFLING SLIDE AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

FALTENHÜLSE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

COULISSE DE FRONCAGE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0886480 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97914409 A

Priority

  • FR 9700470 W
  • FR 9603548 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2745987A1] A ruffling slide for making articles with stretchable portions is disclosed. Said slide includes a tubular sleeve (1) for containing at least one resiliently stretchable wire-like element (5); connecting portions (6) transversely provided on the sleeve and spaced apart in such a way that they define tubular ruffling sections (7), said connecting portions also forming narrowed portions (8) for locally clamping said wire-like element; and at least one wire-like element (5) inserted into the sleeve and clamped at the narrowed portions in such a way that it extends freely through each tubular section and is movable therein between two positions, i.e. an inoperative position (51) and an operative position in which said element is shorter than the section in question, whereby it may subsequently impart a ruffle thereto in a direction substantially perpendicular to the general direction of the sleeve. The slide is useful in nappies and diapers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 27/24; A41F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/49 (2006.01); A41D 27/24 (2006.01); A41F 9/02 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/472 (2006.01); B29C 53/36 (2006.01); B29C 65/00 (2006.01); B29C 65/08 (2006.01); D04D 9/00 (2006.01); D06C 25/00 (2006.01); D06J 1/00 (2006.01); B29C 65/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/15593 (2013.01); A41D 27/245 (2013.01); A41F 9/02 (2013.01); A61F 13/4902 (2013.01); B29C 53/36 (2013.01); B29C 65/087 (2013.01); B29C 66/135 (2013.01); B29C 66/21 (2013.01); B29C 66/232 (2013.01); B29C 66/431 (2013.01); B29C 66/4332 (2013.01); B29C 66/81427 (2013.01); B29C 66/83411 (2013.01); B29C 66/83511 (2013.01); B29C 66/83513 (2013.01); B29C 65/18 (2013.01); B29C 66/69 (2013.01); B29C 66/729 (2013.01); B29C 66/7294 (2013.01); B29C 2053/365 (2013.01); B29L 2031/4878 (2013.01); Y10T 156/101 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1015 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1737 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1334 (2013.01); Y10T 428/139 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24818 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24826 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734506 A1 19970925; AU 2165997 A 19971010; AU 716300 B2 20000224; EP 0886480 A1 19981230; EP 0886480 B1 20011212; FR 2745987 A1 19970919; FR 2745987 B1 19980612; JP 2001504899 A 20010410; JP 3212615 B2 20010925; US 6291039 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170313

2017-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-04-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170313

2017-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160325

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160307

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CERA FRANCE COMPAGNIE D'EQUIPEMENT ROBOTIQUE APPL

- Free text: CERA FRANCE COMPAGNIE D'EQUIPEMENT ROBOTIQUE APPLIQUEE#RUE DU 8 MAI, BOITE POSTALE 12#42390 VILLARS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- CERA FRANCE COMPAGNIE D'EQUIPEMENT ROBOTIQUE APPLIQUEE#RUE DU 8 MAI, BOITE POSTALE 12#42390 VILLARS (FR)

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI SE

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990406

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI SE