Global Patent Index - EP 0886485 B1

EP 0886485 B1 2000-05-03 - MUTUALLY TELESCOPABLE COMPONENTS

Title (en)

MUTUALLY TELESCOPABLE COMPONENTS

Title (de)

TELESKOPIERBAR INEINANDER GEFÜHRTE TEILE

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE D'ELEMENTS TELESCOPIQUES

Publication

EP 0886485 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97906137 A

Priority

  • DE 19609451 A
  • DE 19632400 A
  • EP 9700967 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9733510A1] The invention relates to mutually telescopable components (3, 5), e.g. pipes, especially vacuum cleaner handle sections, in which selected positions can be engaged by means of a locking component (8), where in addition the locking component (8) has a pressure-operable engagement knob (10) and an engagement projection (13) on the engagement knob (10), where said engagement knob (10) is open for operation on a first telescopic section (5) and the engagement projection (13) engages in a second telescopic section (3). To provide an improved engagement component for telescopic sections, especially one of minimum structural height and with a minimum of parts, it is proposed that the engagement knob (10) project from the outer telescopic section (5) for operation and work together with the inner telescopic section (3) via a rocker-like support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/32; A47L 9/24; B25G 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/24 (2006.01); A47L 9/32 (2006.01); B25G 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/32 (2013.01); A47L 9/244 (2013.01); B25G 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9733510 A1 19970918; AT 192300 T 20000515; DK 0886485 T3 20000925; EP 0886485 A1 19981230; EP 0886485 B1 20000503; ES 2146084 T3 20000716; GR 3033838 T3 20001031; PT 886485 E 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170626

2017-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 192300 T

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701584

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160205

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-12-15 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VORWERK & CO. INTERHOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-03-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2003-02-18 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-13 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-11 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-06 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030204

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146084 T3

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701584 20000608

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192300 T 20000515

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990426

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980821

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE