Global Patent Index - EP 0886579 B1

EP 0886579 B1 2001-05-16 - DEVICE FOR DUSTING PRINTED PRODUCTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DUSTING PRINTED PRODUCTS

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM BESTÄUBEN VON DRUCKPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR SAUPOUDRER DES PRODUITS D'IMPRESSION

Publication

EP 0886579 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97901026 A

Priority

  • DE 19609438 A
  • EP 9700147 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19609438A1] A device for dusting printed products (20) has a nozzle lip (40) ejecting a cloud of powder which is surrounded by a suction box (36) extending to a short distance above the surface of a conveyor cylinder (28) on which the printed products (20) are moved past the nozzle lip (40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0771649 A1 19970507 - ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19609438 A1 19970918; DE 19609438 B4 20071011; EP 0886579 A1 19981230; EP 0886579 B1 20010516; JP 2000506090 A 20000523; JP 4118953 B2 20080716; WO 9733753 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703549

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090115

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070115

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090115

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-01 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040928

2005-01-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703549 20010621

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990329

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980727

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT