Global Patent Index - EP 0886584 B1

EP 0886584 B1 2001-05-30 - COVER FOR BINDING MEANS WITH COMB-LIKE RINGS

Title (en)

COVER FOR BINDING MEANS WITH COMB-LIKE RINGS

Title (de)

UMSCHLAG FÜR KAMMBINDUNG

Title (fr)

COUVERTURE POUR RELIURE DU TYPE A PEIGNE

Publication

EP 0886584 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97915324 A

Priority

  • DE 9700381 W
  • DE 19609661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9733762A1] The invention relates to a cover which has a rail with hooks on the inside of the back, into which hooks binding means (13) with comb-like rings is locked.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 11/00; B42D 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9733762 A1 19970918; AT 201632 T 20010615; EP 0886584 A1 19981230; EP 0886584 B1 20010530; JP 3059237 U 19990709

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2005-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020225

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703676 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201632 T 20010615

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJITSU SIEMENS COMPUTERS GMBH

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990325

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980903

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI