Global patent index - EP 0886620 B1

EP 0886620 B1 2000-01-19 - DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY WINDING UP LONGITUDINALLY CUT PAPER WEBS WITH ROLLS CHANGED AUTOMATICALLY AT THE MACHINE SPEED

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUSLY WINDING UP LONGITUDINALLY CUT PAPER WEBS WITH ROLLS CHANGED AUTOMATICALLY AT THE MACHINE SPEED

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN AUFROLLUNG VON LÄNGSGESCHNITTENEN PAPIERBAHNEN MIT AUTOMATISCHEM ROLLENWECHSEL BEI MASCHINENGESCHWINDIGKEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENROULEMENT CONTINU DE BANDES DE PAPIER COUPEES LONGITUDINALEMENT AVEC CHANGEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DES ROULEAUX A VITESSE DE LA MACHINE

Publication

EP 0886620 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97907097 A

Priority

  • DE 19609802 A
  • EP 9701271 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19609802A1] The invention concerns a device for continuously winding up longitudinally cut paper webs with the rolls being changed automatically at the machine speed. The device is characterized by: at least two support rollers (1, 2) disposed separately after a longitudinal cutting arrangement; at least one disc pair (3, 4, 3', 4') per support roller (1, 2), the disc pairs being disposed concentrically to the support rollers (1, 2) and mounted so as to rotate independently of the support rollers (1, 2), the axial distance between the discs being adjustable to the width of the paper webs (15) to be wound up; at least two winding-up devices (5, 6, 7) per disc pair (3, 4, 3', 4') which are guided in a radially adjustable manner in the disc pairs (3, 4, 3', 4') and each comprise a core drive (8) for cardboard tubes (9) to be inserted; and at least one arrangement (10) for cutting a paper web (15), which has been cut to width, transversely to the feed direction and for winding the beginning of a new web on a new cardboard tube (9) which is accelerated to the speed of the machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22; B65H 18/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/02 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/021 (2013.01); B65H 19/2284 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2408/23155 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19609802 A1 19970918; EP 0886620 A1 19981230; EP 0886620 B1 20000119; US 6406417 B1 20020618; WO 9733821 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status

2012-02-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701038

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060313

2005-03-11 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040313

2004-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040313

2003-03-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701038

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980528

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB