Global Patent Index - EP 0886621 B1

EP 0886621 B1 2000-05-24 - DRIVE ARRANGEMENT FOR THE CORE OF A WINDING SPOOL FOR A TRANSFER STRIP OF A TRANSFER DISPENSER

Title (en)

DRIVE ARRANGEMENT FOR THE CORE OF A WINDING SPOOL FOR A TRANSFER STRIP OF A TRANSFER DISPENSER

Title (de)

GETRIEBEANORDNUNG ZUM ANTRIEB DES SPULENKERNS EINER AUFWICKELSPULE FÜR EIN TRANSFERBAND EINES TRANSFERDISPENSERS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION POUR L'ENTRAINEMENT DU NOYAU D'UNE BOBINE RECEPTRICE POUR BANDE DE TRANSFERT D'UN DISTRIBUTEUR DE TRANSFERT

Publication

EP 0886621 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97908161 A

Priority

  • DE 19609533 A
  • EP 9701052 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19609533C1] In a drive arrangement for the core (11) of a winding spool for a transfer strip (5) through the core (3) of a supply spool at the side of and radially staggered from the winding spool in the housing (2) of a transfer dispenser or an interchangeable cassette (1) therefor, with a first sprocket (28) driven by the supply spool which engages with a second sprocket (26, 27) driving the winding spool (11), where the partial diameter of the second sprocket (27) is smaller thant that of the first (28) and a slipping clutch (16) is fitted between the core (11) of one of the two spools and the relevant sprocket (27) and there is a radially projecting annular disc (13; 14) between each spool core (3; 11) and its side facing the other spool, the annular discs (13, 14) of the two spool cores (3, 11) partially bear on each other. In addition, the first sprocket (28) has the shape of an internal gearing (28) bonded to the core (3) of the supply spool, inside which lies the second sprocket (27), where the winding spool can rotate with a central annular sleeve (25) on a bearing spindle (15) integral with the housing or cassette. Said annular sleeve (25) has a lateral attachment (26) which bears the external toothing of the second sprocket meshing with the first (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43L 19/00 (2006.01); B65H 35/07 (2006.01); B65H 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 37/007 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1795 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19609533 C1 19970227; AT 193272 T 20000615; BR 9708020 A 19990727; CA 2248776 A1 19970918; CN 1071282 C 20010919; CN 1211959 A 19990324; DK 0886621 T3 20001009; EP 0886621 A1 19981230; EP 0886621 B1 20000524; ES 2146462 T3 20000801; GR 3033673 T3 20001031; JP 2000506109 A 20000523; NO 311250 B1 20011105; NO 984122 A 19981109; NO 984122 D0 19980907; PL 182980 B1 20020531; PL 328604 A1 19990201; PT 886621 E 20001031; RU 2181337 C2 20020420; TR 9801796 T2 19981221; TW 370510 B 19990921; US 6079660 A 20000627; WO 9733824 A1 19970918; ZA 9702057 B 19970911

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701760

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-08 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-12-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-12-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-12-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020303

2002-10-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-10-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PRITT PRODUKTIONSG- M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-04-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-03-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-03-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020303

2002-03-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020303

2002-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020303

2002-03-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020303

2002-03-03 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020303

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010420

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-04-02 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20010402

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010330

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20010328

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20010314

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010313

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010313

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010313

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010306

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010302

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20010227

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-13 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20010213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-10-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146462 T3

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701760 20000629

2000-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193272 T 20000615

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990607

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980902

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE