Global Patent Index - EP 0886622 B1

EP 0886622 B1 2000-06-21 - YARN SPOOL BEARING FOR TEXTILE FIBRE PRODUCTION FACILITIES

Title (en)

YARN SPOOL BEARING FOR TEXTILE FIBRE PRODUCTION FACILITIES

Title (de)

GARNSPULENLAGER FÜR TEXTILFASER-PRODUKTIONSANLAGEN

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE BOBINE DE FIL POUR INSTALLATIONS DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRES TEXTILES

Publication

EP 0886622 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97916343 A

Priority

  • DE 9700489 W
  • DE 19609668 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19710229A1] A yarn reel store for textile fibre producing plant comprises a buffer for material between a continuous production process and following processing equipment having periods of standstill. The store is formed to take trays (6) which can move within it and yarn reels (1, 2) can be stored on the trays while avoiding contact between tray floor (7) and the reel surfaces (8, 9) facing floor-ward.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 49/38; B65H 67/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/38 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/38 (2013.01); B65H 67/064 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29704497 U1 19970710; AT 193996 T 20000715; BR 9707980 A 19990727; CN 1199836 C 20050504; CN 1216513 A 19990512; DE 19710229 A1 19971106; EP 0886622 A1 19981230; EP 0886622 B1 20000621; ES 2150765 T3 20001201; GR 3033826 T3 20001031; PT 886622 E 20001229; TW 438919 B 20010607; WO 9733825 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701912

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701912

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20120809

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701912

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20120719

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701912

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120719

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701912

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120809

2012-09-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AC-AUTOMATION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AC AUTOMATION GMBH & CO. KG, 54470 BERNKASTEL-KUES, DE

- Document: DE 59701912

- Effective date: 20120809

2012-09-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AC-AUTOMATION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH, 86316 FRIEDBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59701912

- Effective date: 20120719

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030313

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-03-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-03-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-02-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-11-27 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-06-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020610

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020326

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-25 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020325

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020312

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020308

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-08 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020308

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020305

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-20 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-07 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020207

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH

2001-05-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150765 T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-09-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193996 T 20000715

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980903

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE