Global Patent Index - EP 0886623 B1

EP 0886623 B1 2000-03-29 - WINDING MACHINE WITH GUIDING DEVICE

Title (en)

WINDING MACHINE WITH GUIDING DEVICE

Title (de)

AUFSPULMASCHINE MIT ANLEGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

BOBINEUSE A DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE

Publication

EP 0886623 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951964 A

Priority

  • DE 19653544 A
  • EP 9706562 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9828217A1] A winding machine is disclosed for winding several threads (3) on a corresponding number of empty bobbins (4). A thread guide (1) is associated to each empty bobbin (4) to press the thread (3) into a feeding position. The threads (3) are distributed from a winding position to the feeding position by a guiding device (20) which consists of a winding thread guide (13) moved on a guide (2) and of the fixed feeding thread-guides (1). The threads (3) are guided by the winding thread-guide (13) and successively distributed on the feeding thread guides (1) between the winding position and the feeding position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 57/26 (2006.01); B65H 65/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 57/003 (2013.01); B65H 57/26 (2013.01); B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 67/0411 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41856 (2013.01); B65H 2555/11 (2013.01); B65H 2555/13 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9828217 A1 19980702; CN 1096405 C 20021218; CN 1211960 A 19990324; EP 0886623 A1 19981230; EP 0886623 B1 20000329; TW 374751 B 19991121; US 6027063 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701360

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HERMANN KAHLHOEFER

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990202

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980824

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI