Global Patent Index - EP 0886643 A4

EP 0886643 A4 2000-04-19 - HUMAN G-PROTEIN CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR HSATU68

Title (en)

HUMAN G-PROTEIN CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR HSATU68

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHER G-PROTEIN CHEMOKIN REZEPTOR HSATU68

Title (fr)

RECEPTEUR HSATU68 DE LA CHEMOKINE DE LA PROTEINE G HUMAINE

Publication

EP 0886643 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96905151 A

Priority

  • CA 2242908 A
  • US 9600499 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9725340A1] Human G-protein chemokine receptor polypeptides and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptides and a procedure for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptides for identifying antagonists and agonists to such polypeptides and methods of using the agonists and antagonists therapeutically to treat conditions related to the underexpression and overexpression of the G-protein chemokine receptor polypeptides, respectively. Also disclosed are diagnostic methods for detecting a mutation in the G-protein chemokine receptor nucleic acid sequences and detecting a level of the soluble form of the receptors in a sample derived from a host.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07H 21/04; C07K 14/00; C12N 1/21; C12N 5/16; C12N 15/63; C12P 21/00; G01N 33/566

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/16 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12P 21/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/7158 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9218641 A1 19921029 - UNIV BOSTON [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9306229 A1 19930401 - US HEALTH [US]
  • [A] WO 9200986 A1 19920123 - NEUROGENETIC CORP [US]
  • [A] WO 9117174 A1 19911114 - NEUROGENETIC CORP [US]
  • [X] MARCHESE A. ET AL.: "Cloning and chromosomal mapping of three novel genes, GPR9, GPR10, and GPR14, encoding receptors related to Interleukin 8, Neuropeptide Y, and Somatostatin Receptors", GENOMICS, US, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, vol. 29, no. 2, 1995, pages 335 - 344, XP000673922, ISSN: 0888-7543
  • [A] MILLS A. AND DUGGAN M.J.: "Orphan seven transmembrane domain receptors: reversing pharmacology", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 12, 1 February 1994 (1994-02-01), pages 47 - 49, XP002078287, ISSN: 0167-7799
  • See also references of WO 9725340A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9725340 A1 19970717; AU 4898496 A 19970801; CA 2242908 A1 19970717; EP 0886643 A1 19981230; EP 0886643 A4 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-04-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/12 A, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7C 12N 1/21 B, 7C 12N 5/16 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 07K 14/00 B, 7C 12P 21/00 B, 7G 01N 33/566 B

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980811

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE