Global patent index - EP 0886659 B1

EP 0886659 B1 2000-05-31 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MALEIC ACID COPOLYMER WITH FLUORINATED THIOETHER END CAP TO IMPART SOIL AND STAIN RESISTANCE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PREPARING A COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MALEIC ACID COPOLYMER WITH FLUORINATED THIOETHER END CAP TO IMPART SOIL AND STAIN RESISTANCE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND EIN MALEINSÄURECOPOLYMER MIT EINER FLUORIERTEN THIOÄTHER ENDGRUPPE, UM SCHUTZ GEGEN FLECKEN UND SCHMUTZ ZU ERZIELEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE COPOLYMERE D'ACIDE MALEIQUE PROTEGES PAR UN GROUPE TERMINAL THIOETHER FLUORE POUR CONFERER UNE RESISTANCE AUX TACHES ET AUX SALISSURES

Publication

EP 0886659 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97909022 A

Priority

  • US 9703914 W
  • US 61751896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5824372A] A copolymer having units of Formula II: <IMAGE> II wherein M is H, alkali metal, anmonium cation, or a mixture thereof; N is OM or a mixture of OM, OR, and NR1R2 in a molar ratio of (OM):(OR):(NR1R2) of [1-(e+f)]:e:f, wherein e and f are each independently 0 to 0.5, provided that (e+f) is less than 0.8; R, R1, and R2 are each independently H or a branched or straight chain C1-20 alkyl; Y is a C2-10 alkyl, C6-12 aryl, or C4-12 alkoxy; X is a fluorinated thiol radical; Z is H; and v and w are each a positive number such that the molar ratio of v to w is from about 0.4:1 to about 1.3:1 is disclosed.

[origin: US5824372A] A copolymer having units of Formula II: <IMAGE>n, or a mixture thereof; N is OM or a mixture of OM, OR, and NR1R2 in a molar ratio of (OM):(OR):(NR1R2) of [1-(e+f)]:e:f, wherein e and f are each independently 0 to 0.5, provided that (e+f) is less than 0.8; R, R1, and R2 are each independently H or a branched or straight chain C1-20 alkyl; Y is a C2-10 alkyl, C6-12 aryl, or C4-12 alkoxy; X is a fluorinated thiol radical; Z is H; and v and w are each a positive number such that the molar ratio of v to w is from about 0.4:1 to about 1.3:1 is disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 222/06; C08F 8/14; C08F 222/00; D06M 15/277

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 35/00 (2006.01); C08F 8/14 (2006.01); C08F 8/34 (2006.01); C08F 210/00 (2006.01); C08F 212/02 (2006.01); C08F 216/14 (2006.01); C08F 222/02 (2006.01); D06M 15/227 (2006.01); D06M 15/233 (2006.01); D06M 15/263 (2006.01); D06M 15/277 (2006.01); D06M 15/285 (2006.01); D06M 15/356 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/3566 (2013.01); C08F 8/14 (2013.01); C08F 8/34 (2013.01); C08F 222/02 (2013.01); D06M 15/227 (2013.01); D06M 15/233 (2013.01); D06M 15/263 (2013.01); D06M 15/277 (2013.01); D06M 15/285 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/292 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2964 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 8/14 + C08F 222/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5824372 A 19981020; AU 2077697 A 19971001; AU 727201 B2 20001207; CA 2249024 A1 19970918; CN 1105733 C 20030416; CN 1213385 A 19990407; DE 69702186 D1 20000706; DE 69702186 T2 20010301; EP 0886659 A1 19981230; EP 0886659 B1 20000531; JP 2000507282 A 20000613; JP 3723222 B2 20051207; US 5712348 A 19980127; WO 9733926 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070312

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: E.I. *DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060312

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-05-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060312

2006-03-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060305

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050309

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702186

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

1999-07-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR PREPARING A COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MALEIC ACID COPOLYMER WITH FLUORINATED THIOETHER END CAP TO IMPART SOIL AND STAIN RESISTANCE

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990114

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980817

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL