Global Patent Index - EP 0886688 B1

EP 0886688 B1 2000-06-21 - THREAD-DELIVERY APPARATUS

Title (en)

THREAD-DELIVERY APPARATUS

Title (de)

FADENLIEFERGERÄT

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN FIL

Publication

EP 0886688 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97915362 A

Priority

  • DE 19609871 A
  • EP 9701277 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19609871A1] The invention concerns a thread-delivery apparatus (F) with a storage drum (1), a housing boom (6) which is rigid with the housing, and a controlled thread-draw-off brake (B) which is mounted in the housing boom (6) in an axially adjustable manner and comprises an annular brake body (8) which cooperates with a thread-draw-off region (4) of the storage drum (1) and has an outer support ring (9). The outer support ring (9) can be displaced in an annular mounting (7) of the boom (6) within an axial clearance (S) predetermined by axial counter stops (20, 21) and comprises at least one pair of sliding drives (10, 11) which act in opposite senses on the support ring (9) and are disposed on the mounting (7). According to the invention, disposed on at least one axial lateral surface (31, 32) of the support ring (9) is at least one group (2, 2') comprising a plurality of lift-adjusting ramps (2a, 2b, 2c) of different heights which can each be aligned alternatively on an axial counter stop (20, 21) facing this lateral surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/364 (2013.01); D03D 47/365 (2013.01); D03D 47/366 (2013.01); B65H 2551/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19609871 A1 19970918; EP 0886688 A1 19981230; EP 0886688 B1 20000621; US 6095199 A 20000801; WO 9734035 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050312

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-08-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701913 20000727

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990621

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980824

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE