Global patent index - EP 0886845 B1

EP 0886845 B1 2000-01-12 - FUZZY LOGIC-ASSISTED TRAFFIC-RESPONSIVE CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TRAFFIC LIGHT SYSTEMS

Title (en)

FUZZY LOGIC-ASSISTED TRAFFIC-RESPONSIVE CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TRAFFIC LIGHT SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERKEHRSABHÄNGIGE STEUERUNG VON VERKEHRS-LICHTSIGNALANLAGEN MIT HILFE VON FUZZY-LOGIK

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DEPENDANT DU TRAFIC, DE SYSTEMES DE FEUX DE SIGNALISATION, ASSISTE PAR LOGIQUE FLOU

Publication

EP 0886845 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97916338 A

Priority

  • DE 9700471 W
  • DE 19609680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9734274A1] The disclosure relates to a traffic-responsive control system for traffic light systems using a multistage modular fuzzy control (FS) comprising an observation level (BE) and a control level (SE). In the observation level (BE) the processed detector values and data on signal group states (DSD) are processed, e.g. every second, in a first stage with the aid of a data-bank module (DBM) to form compressed signal group-related data. From the latter, in a second stage using a green time requirement module (GBM) and a signal groups weighting module (SGGM), the required green times of individual signal groups and the signal group weightings are calculated. In a third stage in the control level (SE), using a signal/frame plan adaptation module (SRAM) and based on the green time requirement for the subsequent signal cycle, the signal/frame plan is adapted for the subsequent signal cycle, and switching recommendations (SED) for signal groups are generated in a signal group updating module (SGAM) based on the signal/frame plan and the signal group weightings, or alternatively, in a phase-updating module (PAM), the signal group weightings are converted to phase weightings for switching recommendations for the current and/or subsequent phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734274 A1 19970918; AT 188798 T 20000115; AU 2503697 A 19971001; EP 0886845 A1 19981230; EP 0886845 B1 20000112

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070311

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070311

2006-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050303

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000311

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701006

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 188798

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990604

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980903

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL