Global Patent Index - EP 0886849 B1

EP 0886849 B1 2002-09-04 - SAFE MARKING SYSTEM CAPABLE OF BEING PERSONALISED

Title (en)

SAFE MARKING SYSTEM CAPABLE OF BEING PERSONALISED

Title (de)

PERSONALISIERBARE SICHERHEITSMARKIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MARQUAGE SECURISE PERSONNALISABLE

Publication

EP 0886849 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97953007 A

Priority

  • FR 9702417 W
  • FR 9616208 A
  • US 14191198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2757984A1] The invention concerns a security marking system for producing a safe marking label characterised in that it consists of a substrate sheet such as a sheet coated with silicone (1) with two flaps (4, 5) separated by a folding line (6), the first flap (4) supporting on the recto face a first holographic component (2) the face of which coming into contact with the substrate sheet is coated with an adhesive layer, the second flap (5) supporting on the verso face a second component (3) formed by a film coming into contact with the substrate sheet is coated with an adhesive layer and the opposite face of which at least bears official inscriptions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/02 (2006.01); B42D 15/10 (2006.01); B42D 117/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0292 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2757984 A1 19980703; FR 2757984 B1 19990326; AT 223609 T 20020915; DE 69715168 D1 20021010; DE 69715168 T2 20030430; DK 0886849 T3 20021230; EP 0886849 A1 19981230; EP 0886849 B1 20020904; ES 2183232 T3 20030316; LT 4546 B 19990927; LT 98137 A 19990426; PL 185506 B1 20030530; PL 328703 A1 19990215; PT 886849 E 20030131; RU 2188459 C2 20020827; US 6019395 A 20000201; WO 9829857 A1 19980709

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171223

2018-01-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171223

2017-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-12-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715168

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070704

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061226

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061226

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *HOLOGRAM - INDUSTRIES

- Effective date: 20051231

2006-10-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-02 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060102

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051226

2005-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-07-25 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-06-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041225

2004-12-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041224

2004-12-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041204

2004-10-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-15 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20041015

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040615

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-12-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-17 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20031017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-07-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183232 T3

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404078

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021129

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-23 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20021223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715168 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223609 T 20020915

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990916

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980807

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE