Global Patent Index - EP 0886878 B1

EP 0886878 B1 2000-01-19 - SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (en)

SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHALTEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION

Publication

EP 0886878 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97915342 A

Priority

  • DE 9700478 W
  • DE 19610133 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9734311A1] The proposed switching device has the advantageous features of semiconductor switching elements (1) while at the same time meeting the requirement for a visible isolating distance (4). This is done by incorporating the semiconductor switching elements (1) in a moving switching element (2) which creates the isolating distance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/548 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734311 A1 19970918; CN 1068137 C 20010704; CN 1212784 A 19990331; EP 0886878 A1 19981230; EP 0886878 B1 20000119; US 6215632 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701039

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701039 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990114

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980903

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR