Global Patent Index - EP 0886881 B1

EP 0886881 B1 2000-06-14 - GAS DISCHARGE LAMP, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR-VEHICLE HEADLIGHTS

Title (en)

GAS DISCHARGE LAMP, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR-VEHICLE HEADLIGHTS

Title (de)

GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG-SCHEINWERFER

Title (fr)

LAMPE LUMINESCENTE A GAZ, NOTAMMENT POUR PHARE DE VEHICULE

Publication

EP 0886881 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97916328 A

Priority

  • DE 9700423 W
  • DE 19610387 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19610387A1] The invention relates to a gas discharge lamp, in particular for motor-vehicle headlights, which has a maintaining-arc vessel (10) consisting of glass or the like and containing a gas. Two main electrodes (17, 18) protrude into said vessel by way of gas-tight electrode bushings (15, 16). A maintaining-arc distance is provided between the end regions of the main electrodes (17, 18), which regions are arranged in the maintaining-arc vessel (10), and an arc (19) forms along said maintaining-arc distance during operation. To achieve the lowest possible striking voltage, means for producing a creepage distance are provided along the inner vessel wall, or a spark gap (32), smaller than the maintaining-arc distance, in the form of the starting distance which is separate from the maintaining-arc distance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/547 (2013.01); H01J 61/54 (2013.01); H01J 61/545 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19610387 A1 19970918; EP 0886881 A1 19981230; EP 0886881 B1 20000614; JP 2000506672 A 20000530; US 6445129 B1 20020903; WO 9735335 A1 19970925

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701881

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120306

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701881 20000720

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990219

1999-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEILER, HARTMUT

1999-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WIZEMANN, THOMAS

1999-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GORILLE, INGO

1999-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PFAFF, WOLFGANG

1999-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUETZE, WOLFGANG

1999-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, BERND

1999-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KERN, ROBERT

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981016

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT