Global Patent Index - EP 0886882 B1

EP 0886882 B1 2000-05-31 - GAS DISCHARGE LAMP, IN PARTICULAR FOR A MOTOR-VEHICLE HEADLIGHT

Title (en)

GAS DISCHARGE LAMP, IN PARTICULAR FOR A MOTOR-VEHICLE HEADLIGHT

Title (de)

GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG-SCHEINWERFER

Title (fr)

LAMPE LUMINESCENTE A GAZ, NOTAMMENT POUR PHARE DE VEHICULE

Publication

EP 0886882 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97916330 A

Priority

  • DE 9700425 W
  • DE 19610385 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19610385A1] The invention relates to a gas discharge lamp, in particular for motor-vehicle headlights, which has a maintaining-arc vessel (10) consisting of glass or the like, having at least two electrodes (15, 16, 23) and provided with a lamp base (11) which can be inserted into a base holder and has the electric connections (20, 21). A ballast is arranged in the lamp base (11) and supplies the lamp with the required starting and maintaining-arc voltage. Housing the ballast in the lamp base (11) produces an on-board, compact gas discharge lamp with short high voltage leads, thereby keeping the starting voltage low.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/02 (2006.01); H01J 61/56 (2006.01); H05B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1109 (2013.01); F21S 48/1186 (2013.01); H01J 61/56 (2013.01); H05B 41/042 (2013.01); H01J 61/84 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19610385 A1 19970918; EP 0886882 A1 19981230; EP 0886882 B1 20000531; EP 0886882 B2 20050413; ES 2148958 T3 20001016; JP 2000506673 A 20000530; US 6194834 B1 20010227; WO 9735336 A1 19970925

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080330

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070306

2009-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060307

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000531

2005-07-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050724

2005-05-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-04-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050413

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OSRAM GMBH

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148958 T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701814 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990712

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981016

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE