Global Patent Index - EP 0887027 B1

EP 0887027 B1 2002-09-04 - Multilayer sole coupled to a reinforcement of the shoe upper

Title (en)

Multilayer sole coupled to a reinforcement of the shoe upper

Title (de)

Mehrschichtige Sohle angeordnet an einem Versteifungselement für den Schuhoberteil

Title (fr)

Semelle multicouche couplée à un renfort de la tige de la chaussure

Publication

EP 0887027 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98110786 A

Priority

FR 9708555 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887027A1] The boot (1) comprises a sole (2) made in three layers, namely a wear layer (3), a tendon layer (4) and a comfort layer (5). It also has a reinforcing part (20) which is cut out of the tendon layer. The reinforcing part has the shape of an arched band (20') contouring the region (34) corresponding to the malleolus of the user's foot. The reinforcing part is coupled to the tendon layer in a region (24) located between the heel (22) and the front end (23) of the sole. It extends freely on the edges (12,12') of the upper (10) into the rear region. The comfort layer is interposed between the user's foot and the tendon layer. The sole provides excellent lateral hold of the foot without interfering with the shock absorption of the comfort layer and leaves the heel free to flex.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/00; A43B 7/22; A43B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 7/14 (2006.01); A43B 7/18 (2006.01); A43B 13/12 (2006.01); A43B 23/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/026 (2013.01); A43B 5/00 (2013.01); A43B 5/002 (2013.01); A43B 7/14 (2013.01); A43B 7/18 (2013.01); A43B 13/12 (2013.01); A43B 23/17 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887027 A1 19981230; EP 0887027 B1 20020904; AT 223163 T 20020915; CA 2242013 A1 19981227; DE 69807594 D1 20021010; DE 69807594 T2 20030522; ES 2179403 T3 20030116; FR 2765083 A1 19981231; FR 2765083 B1 19990827; US 6000148 A 19991214

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080613

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080612

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080613

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080612

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080612

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070606

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050612

2004-06-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179403 T3

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807594 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223163 T 20020915

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001121

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990506

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI