Global Patent Index - EP 0887090 B1

EP 0887090 B1 2002-12-18 - Process for producing ski edges for snowboards, and ski edges obtainable by the process

Title (en)

Process for producing ski edges for snowboards, and ski edges obtainable by the process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Skikanten für Gleitbretter, und dadurch herstellbare Skikanten

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation de carres pour planche de glisse, et carres réalisables par ce procédé

Publication

EP 0887090 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98420083 A

Priority

FR 9708369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887090A1] The process of preparing the edges (5) of a snowboard comprises filling the spaces or cavities (2) left between the edge anchoring fins (1) with a synthetic material (6). This filling is made so that its internal surface intended to be in contact with the base plate is smooth and without depressions. The process enables the internal surfaces in contact with the base plate to be without any depressions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887090 A1 19981230; EP 0887090 B1 20021218; AT 229833 T 20030115; DE 69810195 D1 20030130; DE 69810195 T2 20030717; FR 2765113 A1 19981231; FR 2765113 B1 19990820

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2006-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060519

2006-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810195 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810195 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229833 T 20030115

2002-10-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SKI EDGES FOR SNOWBOARDS, AND SKI EDGES OBTAINABLE BY THE PROCESS

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990610

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI