Global Patent Index - EP 0887111 B1

EP 0887111 B1 2002-12-11 - Road marking vehicle with a pump driven proportionally to the vehicle speed

Title (en)

Road marking vehicle with a pump driven proportionally to the vehicle speed

Title (de)

Strassenmarkierungsmaschine mit fahrgeschwindigkeitsproportional angetriebener Pumpenkombination

Title (fr)

Machine de marquage de routes avec un ensemble de pompe entrainé de façon proportionnelle à la vitesse de déplacement

Publication

EP 0887111 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108030 A

Priority

DE 19727622 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19727622C1] The machine has at least one spray gun (113), for directing a pumped marking material on to the road surface and a pair of displacement pumps (1a,1b), for dosed delivery of the marking material to the spray gun, which are operated in combination depending on the velocity of the marking machine. Each pump has a hydraulic drive cylinder and a controlled outlet valve for providing a pressure during the initial feed stroke which is equal to the feed pressure of the other pump which is already in operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 9/06; E01C 23/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727622 C1 19981022; DK 0887111 T3 20030407; EP 0887111 A2 19981230; EP 0887111 A3 19990818; EP 0887111 B1 20021211; ES 2190806 T3 20030816; US 6047902 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-07 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20180502

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040503

2005-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2004-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190806 T3

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030529

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-04-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK ES FR GB

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2000-05-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-04-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK ES FR GB

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000204

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DK ES FR GB

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI