Global patent index - EP 0887122 A3

EP 0887122 A3 2000-01-12 - High pressure water cleaning device

Title (en)

High pressure water cleaning device

Title (de)

Wasser-Hochdruckreinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage à l'eau sous haute pression

Publication

EP 0887122 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102583 A

Priority

DE 19726794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887122A2] The cleaning appliance has a high pressure pump (8) with a drive unit (6), and is formed as a gear pump with an internally toothed gear ring (9), and externally toothed pinion (10) having a different number of teeth. Parts of the pump coming into contact with the cleaning water consist of a corrosion-proof material, especially a metal compound. The gear ring and pinion preferably consist of material having sufficient surface hardness in water and good sliding characteristics, and are preferably of a sintered material. This material preferably has a plasma-nitride-treated surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02; F04C 2/10; F04C 13/00; F04C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01); F04C 2/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/026 (2013.01); F04C 2/082 (2013.01); F04C 2230/22 (2013.01); F04C 2230/92 (2013.01); F05C 2203/08 (2013.01); F05C 2253/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887122 A2 19981230; EP 0887122 A3 20000112; DE 19726794 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status

2001-04-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7B 08B 3/02 A, 7F 04C 15/00 B, 7F 04C 13/00 B, 7F 04C 2/10 B

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI