Global Patent Index - EP 0887123 A3

EP 0887123 A3 2000-03-01 - Device for coupling a shifting means

Title (en)

Device for coupling a shifting means

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ankuppeln eines Verschiebemittels

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour accoupler un moyen de déplacement

Publication

EP 0887123 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111426 A

Priority

DE 19727619 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887123A2] The apparatus serves for coupling a shunter unit (1) to a roll change carriage (10) or a roll stand. The shunter unit has a coupling head (4) housing in its interior an axially movable member (5) provided with radially displaceable engagement elements (8). These elements engage a coupling housing (9) which is attached to the carriage (10) and, in the coupling position, surrounds the coupling head (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/103 (2013.01); B21B 2203/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 2552188 A1 19770602 - SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198435, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M21, AN 1984-218462, XP002125554
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198840, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M21, AN 1988-283697, XP002125555
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 131 (M - 584) 24 April 1987 (1987-04-24)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887123 A2 19981230; EP 0887123 A3 20000301; EP 0887123 B1 20011114; AT 208663 T 20011115; DE 19727619 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020623

2002-06-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020622

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802122 20011220

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2001-11-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208663 T 20011115

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT SE

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980622

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI