Global Patent Index - EP 0887125 A3

EP 0887125 A3 2001-05-09 - Inlet for the chain of a drawing machine

Title (en)

Inlet for the chain of a drawing machine

Title (de)

Ketteneinlauf an Raupenketten-Ziehmaschinen

Title (fr)

Entrée pour la chenille d'une machine d'étirage

Publication

EP 0887125 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250204 A

Priority

DE 19727699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887125A2] The drawing tools are fastened to the drive chains, and each drive chain (2,3) is guided at least on the approach side on a constant deflection track (7). To reduce radial acceleration of the chain links in the contact area (8) of the drawing tools (6) on the workpieces, the curve radius of the track is larger than half the distance between the drive chains. The track curve is described by a cycloid function or by a multi- sectional three-centre curve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727699 A1 19981224; EP 0887125 A2 19981230; EP 0887125 A3 20010509

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI