Global Patent Index - EP 0887130 B1

EP 0887130 B1 2002-09-11 - Pressure die cast engine housing, in particular for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Pressure die cast engine housing, in particular for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Im Druckgiessverfahren gefertigtes Maschinengehäuse, insbesondere für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Carter de machines produit par coulée sous pression, en particulier pour une machine à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0887130 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107786 A

Priority

DE 19727566 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887130A1] The method concerns die casting of a machine housing which has a number of chambers (3) produced using a hollow insert (2). The insert is positioned on an essentially floating mandrel (4) in the casting die.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/0009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887130 A1 19981230; EP 0887130 B1 20020911; DE 19727566 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160429

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160429

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805477

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150411

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-06 [REG IE CA39] APPLICATION FOR SURRENDER NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION -SECTION 39

2015-04-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805477 20021017

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRESSURE DIE CAST ENGINE HOUSING, IN PARTICULAR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000406

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990619

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI