Global Patent Index - EP 0887284 B1

EP 0887284 B1 2001-03-14 - Device for containing foodstuffs

Title (en)

Device for containing foodstuffs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme von Lebensmitteln

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contenir des denrées alimentaires

Publication

EP 0887284 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98110957 A

Priority

DE 19726360 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887284A1] The food plate comprises a first plastics food dish (1) with a sidewall or rim which can be clipped on to the sidewall or rim of a second plastics food dish (7). The first dish is smaller than the second dish. The first dish holds food such as tomato ketchup, mustard or salad dressing which is required as an additive to the food, in the second dish which is the main dish.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32; B65D 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/02 (2006.01); B65D 25/22 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3283 (2013.01); B65D 21/0213 (2013.01); B65D 25/22 (2013.01); B65D 81/3205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887284 A1 19981230; EP 0887284 B1 20010314; AT 199697 T 20010315; DE 19726360 A1 19981224

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2004-06-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040619

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010616

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800522 20010419

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2001-03-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199697 T 20010315

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000316

1999-12-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE LI

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990331

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI