Global Patent Index - EP 0887293 B1

EP 0887293 B1 2002-11-06 - Roll cutting device for a material web

Title (en)

Roll cutting device for a material web

Title (de)

Rollenschneidvorrichtung für eine Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe à rouleaux pour une bande de matière

Publication

EP 0887293 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98109962 A

Priority

DE 19727327 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887293A2] The cutter unit (4) cuts the material (3) into part-webs which are wound in a winder unit into part-web rolls (5,5',6,6') each of which has its own winder unit (39,39',39"). At least two winder units are positioned in a shared reel positioning groups (7,8). All the part-web rolls share a common pressure roller (20,21). Each winder unit has a positioner drive mechanism (24) holding the part-web roll against the pressure roller. The positioner drive mechanism has a sensor (37,38) measuring the diameter of the part-web roll. The pressure roller is contained in a carriage (32,33) movable at right angles to the axis of the part-web rolls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/10; B65H 18/26; B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/10 (2006.01); B65H 18/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2284 (2013.01); B65H 18/10 (2013.01); B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41486 (2013.01); B65H 2511/142 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/142 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887293 A2 19981230; EP 0887293 A3 19990922; EP 0887293 B1 20021106; DE 19727327 A1 19990107; DE 19727327 C2 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060602

2005-06-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-06-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030602

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806149 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER GMBH

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990813

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI