Global Patent Index - EP 0887304 B1

EP 0887304 B1 2002-09-04 - Valve for pressure vessel

Title (en)

Valve for pressure vessel

Title (de)

Ventil für Druckbehälter

Title (fr)

Soupape pour récipient sous pression

Publication

EP 0887304 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98111452 A

Priority

JP 16741397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887304A1] A valve for a pressure vessel comprises a hollow housing member (10), a tubular member (10A), a sealing member and a spring member. The housing member has connecting portions (11) each provided with a groove (11A,11B) and a stopping projection. The groove has the vertical (11A) and transverse (11B) groove portions. The stopping projection (10B) extends upward from the bottom of the transverse groove portion. The tubular member has engaging projections (11C) extending outward, which are to be inserted into the transverse groove portions. The second groove portion has at its opposite side to the stopping projection an engaging groove portion. The engaging projection of the tubular member is engageable with the engaging groove portion. The engaging groove portion has a width smaller than the width of the transverse groove portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/04 (2006.01); B01J 3/03 (2006.01); B67D 1/08 (2006.01); F16J 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/0838 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887304 A1 19981230; EP 0887304 B1 20020904; DE 69807598 D1 20021010; DE 69807598 T2 20030605; DK 0887304 T3 20021028; JP 3459338 B2 20031020; JP H1113999 A 19990122

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080622

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080622

2009-02-02 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-10-28 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807598 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011219

1999-10-20 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19990819

1999-10-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

1999-09-08 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990629

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI