Global Patent Index - EP 0887445 B1

EP 0887445 B1 2002-11-06 - Carding bar

Title (en)

Carding bar

Title (de)

Deckelstab

Title (fr)

Barre de chapeau

Publication

EP 0887445 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810526 A

Priority

CH 154897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887445A1] The new cover rod is used in the textile industry. It has a flexible carding covering. The cover rod is novel in that one, and preferably both of the regions bordering its longitudinal edges, is covered with points. Preferred corresponding carding equipment is claimed. Further details of the fastening and supports are included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/24; D01G 15/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/24 (2006.01); D01G 15/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/24 (2013.01); D01G 15/92 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887445 A1 19981230; EP 0887445 B1 20021106; EP 0887445 B2 20070314; DE 59806150 D1 20021212

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160609

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806150

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090609

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-04 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-06-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2007-03-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2007-01-10 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CARDING BAR

2003-08-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20030708

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806150 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001222

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990115

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI