Global Patent Index - EP 0887447 A3

EP 0887447 A3 2000-04-05 - Method for the continuous manufacturing of a yarn with low curling tendency

Title (en)

Method for the continuous manufacturing of a yarn with low curling tendency

Title (de)

Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Herstellung eines Zwirnes mit geringer Kringelneigung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un fil avec une faible inclinaison de vrillage

Publication

EP 0887447 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105154 A

Priority

DE 19727176 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887447A2] In the continuous prodn. of a twisted yarn, the twisting process is directly after the spinning stage, such as air spinning or open-end spinning. The time gap between the end of the spinning phase and the end of the twisting phase is 1 sec. The draw tension on the yarn is generally at the same value at the end of the spinning stage as at the end of the twisting stage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/08; D01H 7/86; D02G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/00 (2006.01); D01H 1/10 (2006.01); D01H 1/115 (2006.01); D01H 4/00 (2006.01); D01H 4/08 (2006.01); D01H 7/02 (2006.01); D01H 7/86 (2006.01); D01H 7/88 (2006.01); D01H 7/90 (2006.01); D01H 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/88 (2013.01); D01H 1/115 (2013.01); D01H 4/00 (2013.01); D01H 7/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727176 C1 19981112; CZ 9802059 A3 19990113; EP 0887447 A2 19981230; EP 0887447 A3 20000405; EP 0887447 B1 20030604; JP H1143833 A 19990216; TR 9801208 A2 19991021; TR 9801208 A3 19991021; US 6006509 A 19991228

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-12-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2001-01-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLKMANN GMBH

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI